Governing document FRIENDS OF LEARNING DISABLED (NORTH DORSET)
Charity number: 260092
Up to date
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
RULES ADOPTED 19/01/1970 AS AMENDED ON 10/04/1990 AS AMENDED ON 04/12/2001 AS AMENDED ON 02/04/2003 AS AMENDED ON 31/03/2004 AS AMENDED ON 06/09/2011
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF PERSONS RESIDENT AT SHERBORNE HOUSES FOR THE LEARNING DISABLED AND CLIENTS OF THE WHITE HOUSE DAY CENTRE BY THE PROVISION OF FINANCIAL AND OTHER CHARITABLE SUPPORT FOR THE PURCHASE OF SUCH EQUIPMENT AND FACILITIES NO PROVIDED BY STATUTORY MEANS.
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
NOT DEFINED
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.