THE SEQUAL TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Sequal Trust fundraises to provide communication equipment to disabled people
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 05 December 1969: Standard registration
- POSSUM USERS ASSOCIATION (Previous name)
- SEQUAL (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rebecca Cheetham | Trustee | 27 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jeremy Sowter | Trustee | 13 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
JACKIE CHEETHAM | Trustee | 09 October 2012 |
|
|
||||
KEITH VERNON FORD | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
PAT REDFERN | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £177.68k | £243.55k | £204.53k | £170.29k | £149.76k | |
|
Total expenditure | £255.73k | £172.85k | £187.01k | £215.01k | £206.76k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 13 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 13 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 02 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 02 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 19 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 29 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 30 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 25 March 2021 | 53 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
RULES ADOPTED 29 NOVEMBER 1969 AS AMENDED 24 JULY 1983, 17 OCTOBER 1992, 18 JULY 1998, 2 MARCH 2002 AND 1 FEBRUARY 2003. as amended on 23 May 2019
Charitable objects
The aim of the Association is the relief of persons who have speech, movement or severe learning difficulties and have problems in communicating which require the provision of augmentative speech aids.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
2C Wharf Road
ELLESMERE
Shropshire
SY12 0EL
- Phone:
- 01691624222
- Email:
- info@thesequaltrust.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window