Governing document THE SEQUAL TRUST
Charity Number: 260119

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
RULES ADOPTED 29 NOVEMBER 1969 AS AMENDED 24 JULY 1983, 17 OCTOBER 1992, 18 JULY 1998, 2 MARCH 2002 AND 1 FEBRUARY 2003. as amended on 23 May 2019
Charitable objects
The aim of the Association is the relief of persons who have speech, movement or severe learning difficulties and have problems in communicating which require the provision of augmentative speech aids.
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
NOT DEFINED
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.