Governing document THE ST MARGARET'S BAY TRUST
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 3 DECEMBER 1969, AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 4 JULY 1973, SUPPLEMENTAL DEED DATED 13 MAY 1976 AND SCHEMES OF 11 NOVEMBER 1998, 19 JANUARY 2005 AND ORDER DATED 14 APRIL 2005.
Charitable objects
THE PRESERVATION OF OR THE PROVISION OF ASSISTANCE TOWARDS THE PRESERVATION OF THE NATURAL BEAUTY ASPECTS, FEATURES, ANIMAL AND PLANT LIFE OF THE BEACHES AND LANDS COMPRISED IN AND ADJOINING THE PARISH OF ST MARGARET'S AT CLIFFE KENT, AND THE AMENITIES THEREOF AND THEREIN SO THAT THE SAID BEACHES, PROPERTIES, LANDS AND AMENITIES WILL BE AVAILABLE AT ALL TIMES FOR ACCESS AND ENJOYMENT BY AND FOR THE RECREATION OF THE PUBLIC AND ALSO TO EDUCATE THE PUBLIC IN THE GEOGRAPHY, HISTORY, NATURAL HISTORY AND ARCHITECTURE OF THE SAID AREA.
Area of benefit
ST MARGARET'S AT CLIFFE.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.