DUDLEY SENIOR CITIZENS AND CHILDRENS TREAT FUND
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
ANNUAL ALL EXPENSES PAID (INCLUDING CASH GIFTS) DAY TRIP FOR BENEFIT OF PERSONS AGED 60 YEARS AND OVER LIVING WITHIN THE DEFINED AREA OF BENEFIT. CHRISTMAS PARTY (INCLUDING CASH GIFTS) FOR BENEFIT OF CHILDREN AGED 3 TO 15 YEARS LIVING WITHIN THE DEFINED AREA OF BENEFIT. MAKE GRANTS TO BOTH LOCAL SCHOOLS COVERING CHILDREN AGED 3 TO 15 YEARS WITHIN DEFINED AREA OF BENEFIT.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 January 2017
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Other Charitable Activities
- North Tyneside
- Northumberland
Governance
- 08 January 1970: Standard registration
- 05 July 2018: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- DUDLEY AGED PEOPLES TREAT FUND (Previous name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 19/01/2013 | 19/01/2014 | 19/01/2015 | 19/01/2016 | 31/01/2017 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £13.60k | £11.84k | £5.40k | £850 | £807 | |
|
Total expenditure | £10.77k | £12.35k | £8.87k | £7.51k | £6.81k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 January 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2017 | 03 October 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2017 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 19 January 2016 | 20 June 2016 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 19 January 2016 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 19 January 2015 | 09 March 2015 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 19 January 2015 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
RULES ADOPTED 30 NOVEMBER 1969 AS AMENDED 11 FEBRUARY 2001
Charitable objects
1.1 FOR THE BENEFIT OF PERSONS AGED 60 YEARS AND OVER LIVING WITHIN THE VILLAGE OF DUDLEY(AS DEFINED IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT) IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF THE SAID BENEFICIARIES. 1.2 FOR THE BENEFIT OF CHILDREN AGED BETWEEN 3 AND 15 YEARS LIVING IN THE VILLAGE OF DUDLEY IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF THE SAID INHABITANTS.
Area of benefit
DUDLEY AND DISTRICT
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window