THE VILLAGE HALL (WENSLEYDALE)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Village hall available for use by the community.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

11 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Amateur Sport
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- North Yorkshire
Governance
- 14 January 1970: Standard registration
- BAINBRIDGE VILLAGE HALL (Working name)
- TEMPERANCE HALL CHARITY (Previous name)
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JAMES PARFITT | Chair | 20 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jenny Draper | Trustee | 22 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Tina Marie Spence | Trustee | 01 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
Roxana Cloughton | Trustee | 01 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
Denise Percival | Trustee | 21 January 2015 |
|
|
||||
KATHRYN ANNE CLOUGHTON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ROGER FRANCIS LAMBERT | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JEAN ABRAHAM | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MARGARET JOYCE PRESTON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
RITA CLOUGHTON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MARK ALLEN | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.89k | £13.48k | £8.56k | £5.29k | £2.39k | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.89k | £2.59k | £1.57k | £5.22k | £6.84k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | £95 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £11.33k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 25 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 07 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 19 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 29 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 04 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF THE 30TH JANUARY 1998
Charitable objects
PROVISION AND MAINTENANCE OF THE VILLAGE HALL FOR USE OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE AOB FOR LEISURE AND RECREATIONAL PURPOSES. THE LAND AND BUILDING TO BE HELD UPON TRUST FOR THE PURPOSE OF THE VILLAGE HALL.
Area of benefit
WENSLEYDALE
Contact information
- Address:
-
9 Holmbrae
Bainbridge
LEYBURN
DL8 3EB
- Phone:
- 01969650744
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window