Financial history MAXWELL WORKMAN TRUST

Charity Number: 260193
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/11/2020 30/11/2021 30/11/2022 30/11/2023 30/11/2024
Total gross income £633 £595 £616 £628 £647
Total expenditure £640 £375 £518 £704 £704
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A