DISABLED DRIVERS' MOTOR CLUB

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Promoting mobility for disabled people.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2024
People

1 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 28 January 1974: Standard registration
- D D M C (Working name)
- DISABLED DRIVERS' MOTOR CLUB LIMITED (Previous name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
1 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DISABLED MOTORING UK | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | 30/09/2024 | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2024 | 26 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 19 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 05 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 08 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 28 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 15 OCTOBER 1964 AMENDED 22 JULY 1973, 19 APRIL 1980, 21 AUGUST 1982, 31 OCTOBER 1982, 13 MAY 1990, 20 OCTOBER 1991, 24 APRIL 1994, 16 NOVEMBER 1997, AND 30 APRIL 2000 (CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION)
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE AND PROTECT THE INTEREST AND WELFARE OF PHYSICALLY DISABLED DRIVERS AND TO HELP AND ENCOURAGE THE DISABLED TO ACHIEVE GREATER MOBILITY
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Folly Farm
Upgate Street
Carleton Rode
NORWICH
NR16 1NJ
- Phone:
- 01508489449
- Email:
- info@disabledmotoring.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window