CHARITY OF CLEMENT ROEBUCK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To provide living accomodation for 4 persons or Couples to persons who have lived in the in the parishes of Kettlewell & Starbotton, Conistone& kilnsey, Buckden .
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Accommodation/housing
- Elderly/old People
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- North Yorkshire
Governance
- 28 April 1970: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Suzanne Wendy Hall | Trustee | 10 May 2012 |
|
|||||
JAMES H SAYER | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £6.66k | £6.60k | £7.13k | £7.29k | £6.76k | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.97k | £9.80k | £5.12k | £7.79k | £15.06k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 25 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 02 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 19 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 12 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 04 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF 27 AUGUST 1981
Charitable objects
THE PROVISION OF ALMSHOUSES FOR AGED PERSONS OF LIMITED INCOME RESIDENT IN THE PARISHES OF CONISTONE-WITH-KILNSEY, KETTLEWELL-WITH-STARBOTTON AND BUCKDEN.
Area of benefit
CONISTON-WITH-KILNSEY,KETTLEWELL-WITH-STARBOTTON AND BUCKDEN
Contact information
- Address:
-
HIDEAWAY COTTAGE
MIDDLE LANE
KETTLEWELL
SKIPTON
BD23 5QX
- Phone:
- 01756760371
- Email:
- jlhideaway@btinternet.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window