THE NEONATAL SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Neonatal Society was founded in 1959 to bring together scientists and clinicians with an interest in the fetus and newborn. The object of the Society is the promotion of Neonatal Science. McCance travel bursaries are available to support researchers who would otherwise be unable to attend the Society's meetings in the UK. The Society hosts four annual commemorative lectures.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
6 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 25 March 1970: Standard registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Christopher Gale | Trustee | 12 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Professor Andrew Ewer | Trustee | 25 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
Professor HELEN BUDGE MA FRCPCH | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £35.03k | £8.51k | £19.90k | £25.99k | £26.20k | |
|
Total expenditure | £53.76k | £16.02k | £17.24k | £34.47k | £26.61k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 26 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 26 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 29 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 30 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 02 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 13 March 2022 | 133 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 23 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 13 March 2022 | 498 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 1968
Charitable objects
THE PROMOTION OF NEONATAL SCIENCE IN ANY MANNER WHICH NOW IS OR HEREAFTER MAY BE DEEMED BY LAW TO BE CHARITABLE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Academic Child Health
NOTTINGHAM UNIVERSITY HOSPITAL
QUEENS MEDICAL CENTRE
DERBY ROAD
NOTTINGHAM
NG7 2UH
- Phone:
- 0115 823 0611
- Email:
- Helen.Budge@nottingham.ac.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window