GRANDBOROUGH CHARITY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity gives financial assistance to residents of the village who need a little help with things like educational books, opticians fees, travel expenses for hospital appointments etc
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Warwickshire
Governance
- 17 March 1970: Standard registration
No other names
- Investment
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
TRACY SARA PAWSEY BSC | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Pauline Stratton | Trustee | 15 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Joy Christine Coling | Trustee | 26 January 2014 |
|
|
||||
KAY ELIZABETH WORRALL | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
REVD CANON BARBARA CAROL CLUTTON | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.22k | £996 | £1.66k | £728 | £1.79k | |
|
Total expenditure | £420 | £1.01k | £1.05k | £780 | £650 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 10 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 16 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 25 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 27 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 09 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF 21 JULY 1976 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 17.01.07
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE EITHER GENERALLY OR INDIVIDUALLY PERSONS RESIDENT IN THE PARISH OF GRANDBOROUGH WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS.
Area of benefit
PARISH OF GRANDBOROUGH
Linked charities
- 17 March 1970 : Standard registration
Contact information
- Address:
-
3 Hargrave Close
Grandborough
Rugby
CV23 8DS
- Phone:
- 01788812945
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window