Accounts and annual returns THE WINNICOTT CLINIC OF PSYCHOTHERAPY

Charity Number: 260427
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2008 02 April 2009 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2008 12 March 2009 On Time
Annual return 31 December 2007 12 August 2008 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2007 22 April 2008 On Time
Annual return 31 December 2006 13 August 2007 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2006 10 August 2007 On Time
Annual return 31 December 2005 13 February 2007 105 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2005 25 October 2006 On Time
Annual return 31 December 2004 11 August 2005 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2004 11 August 2005 On Time