THE DAWN BOOK SUPPLY

Charity Number: 260436
Removed charity

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Publication and distribution of the Dawn Magazine. Publication and distribution of religious books and other religious literature on behalf of the Dawn Christadelphian fellowship. Co-ordination of other religious activities on behalf of the Dawn Christadelphian fellowship. Provide financial support for members of the Dawn Christadelphian fellowship and their families

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2016

Total income: £38,193
Total expenditure: £52,919

Fundraising

This charity does not raise funds from the public

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
  • Overseas Aid/famine Relief
  • Religious Activities
  • Other Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • Other Defined Groups
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Provides Other Finance
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
  • Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
Where the charity operates:
  • Nottingham City

Governance

Registration history:
  • 06 November 1970: Standard registration
  • 22 August 2017: Removed (Transfer of funds)
  • 22 August 2017: Funds transferred to 1170305 DAWN CHRISTADELPHIAN PUBLICATIONS
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • "THE DAWN" BOOK SUPPLY (Previous name)
Gift aid:
No information available
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Conflicting interests
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
No information available

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2012 31/12/2013 31/12/2014 31/12/2015 31/12/2016
Total gross income £52.87k £42.53k £451.26k £35.36k £38.19k
Total expenditure £44.68k £36.31k £56.75k £50.53k £52.92k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A £0 £0

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2016 14 July 2017 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 14 July 2017 On Time
Annual return 31 December 2015 02 June 2016 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2015 02 June 2016 On Time
Annual return 31 December 2014 17 May 2015 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2014 17 May 2015 On Time
Annual return 31 December 2013 16 May 2014 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2013 16 May 2014 On Time