Accounts and annual returns DROYLSDEN INDEPENDENT CHURCH

Charity number: 260438
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 28 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 28 January 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 02 August 2024 184 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 28 January 2025 363 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 30 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 30 January 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 08 March 2022 36 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 08 March 2022 36 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 09 February 2021 9 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 09 February 2021 9 days late Download Open in new window