Financial history DROYLSDEN INDEPENDENT CHURCH

Charity number: 260438
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £49.41k £44.82k £34.15k £33.48k £43.39k
Total expenditure £56.87k £48.25k £37.28k £38.79k £42.65k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A