THE INSTITUTE OF AMATEUR CINEMATOGRAPHERS LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Our annual showcase event British International Film Festival (BIAFF) will be held in May 2023 and takes place in Birmingham. Film & Video Maker magazine is proudly published bi-monthly. Our website continues to help promote and support amateur film making activities. We allocate grants to promote these objectives. For more information, please visit www.theiac.org.uk.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 April 2024
People

11 Trustee(s)
19 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 12 December 1972: Standard registration
- IAC THE FILM & VIDEO INSTITUTE (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Simon Mark Sumner | Chair | 21 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
Jacqueline Williams | Trustee | 21 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
Michael Whyman | Trustee | 15 December 2014 |
|
|
||||
WILLIAM JOHN OWEN | Trustee | 28 November 2011 |
|
|
||||
LINDA GOUGH | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Dr ALAN ATKINSON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
DAVID NEWMAN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MICHAEL GOUGH | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MR TERRY PATRICK FACI | Trustee |
|
||||||
PHILLIP COLLINS FRSA | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ROBERT JOHN DAY | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/04/2020 | 30/04/2021 | 30/04/2022 | 30/04/2023 | 30/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £68.35k | £64.77k | £69.21k | £54.12k | £53.67k | |
|
Total expenditure | £65.99k | £53.30k | £60.95k | £63.44k | £70.27k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £7.93k | £1.42k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2024 | 11 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2024 | 11 February 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2023 | 20 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2023 | 20 February 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2022 | 28 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2022 | 28 February 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2021 | 28 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2021 | 28 February 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2020 | 25 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2020 | 25 February 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 06/10/1932 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 25/02/1972 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 04/11/1972 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 08/10/2000 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 22/10/2006
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE ADVANCEMENT AND IMPROVEMENT OF GENERAL EDUCATION IN RELATION TO ALL ASPECTS OF CINEMATOGRAPHY AND ASSOCIATED AUDIO AND VISUAL ARTS AND THE DEVELOPMENT OF PUBLIC APPRECIATION OF SUCH ARTS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
McCracken Park
Great North Road
Gosforth
NEWCASTLE UPON TYNE
NE3 2DT
- Phone:
- 01913038960
- Email:
- admin@theiac.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window