SLINDON RELIEF IN NEED CHARITY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Gives practical and financial assistance to 'those in need hardship or distress' in the parish of Slindon or closely associated with it. Its main function is to make grants to needy persons, normally in time for Christmas, but occasionally at other times for specific purposes.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 24 July 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- West Sussex
Governance
- 23 July 1971: Standard registration
- THE SLINDON FUND (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
PAULA WILLIAMS | Trustee | 14 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Sandra Izard | Trustee | 03 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rev Peter Dyson | Trustee | 25 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
PHILIP VERNON BERRY | Trustee | 01 December 2015 |
|
|
||||
KAREN R COBURN | Trustee | 09 December 2013 |
|
|
||||
SUSAN WINIFRED HARRISON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ANITA REDMAN | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 24/07/2020 | 24/07/2021 | 24/07/2022 | 24/07/2023 | 24/07/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.86k | £1.76k | £2.79k | £3.03k | £4.06k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.14k | £483 | £820 | £835 | £1.05k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 24 July 2024 | 25 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 24 July 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 24 July 2023 | 19 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 24 July 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 24 July 2022 | 08 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 24 July 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 24 July 2021 | 08 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 24 July 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 24 July 2020 | 31 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 24 July 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF 23 JULY 1971
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE EITHER GENERALLY OR INDIVIDUALLY PERSONS WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED, HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS.
Area of benefit
PARISH OF SLINDON
Contact information
- Address:
-
39 King George Gardens
CHICHESTER
PO19 6LB
- Phone:
- 01243532115
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window