MATLOCK HOSPITALS LEAGUE OF FRIENDS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We financially support the NHS run Whitworth Hospital (Community Hospital) and Orchard Cottage (Short Break Residential Unit for people with Learning Disability), both in Darley Dale, Matlock, Derbyshire. Items of equipment and larger projects such as car parking and departmental refurbishments over and above those supplied by the NHS are funded by us through legacies and donations received.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

15 Trustee(s)
15 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Derbyshire
Governance
- 23 March 1971: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
15 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
STEVEN IAN WALKER | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Stuart Ronald Marriott | Trustee | 26 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Alice Joyce Harnell | Trustee | 26 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
HELEN DALTON | Trustee | 26 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
JILL FEARN | Trustee | 27 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
DAVID ALAN BRUNT | Trustee | 24 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
ALISON WILDGOOSE | Trustee | 25 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
COLIN BEAMISS | Trustee | 03 June 2016 |
|
|
||||
BRIAN WOOD | Trustee | 08 November 2012 |
|
|
||||
MICHAEL TOMLINSON | Trustee | 12 March 2012 |
|
|
||||
RICHARD STEVEN HOLLINGWORTH IT OFFICER | Trustee | 01 April 2011 |
|
|
||||
PETER VINCENT | Trustee | 06 June 1966 |
|
|
||||
PAMELA BARBARA MBE WILDGOOSE HON SEC | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
THOMAS JOHN PILKINGTON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MARY ELIZABETH MACDONALD | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £380.97k | £4.18k | £6.24k | £162.44k | £21.38k | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.72k | £7.92k | £31.12k | £157.08k | £79.61k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 18 May 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 01 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 01 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 31 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 28 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 27 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 27 August 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 1968 AS AMENDED 4 MARCH 1971 AND 24 APRIL 2009
Charitable objects
(A) TO MOBILISE, ENCOURAGE, FOSTER AND MAINTAIN THE INTEREST OF THE PUBLIC IN THE PATIENTS AND THE SUPPORT OF THE WORK OF THE HOSPITALS BY THE MEANS OF VOLUNTARY SERVICE (B) TO PROVIDE FUNDS FOR THE PURPOSE OF SUPPLEMENTING IN SUCH MANNER AS THE LEAGUE OF FRIENDS THINK FIT THE RESOURCES OF THE HOSPITAL SERVICE (C) TO RECRUIT AND ASSIST IN THE RECRUITMENT OF VOLUNTARY WORKERS IN AND FOR THE HOSPITALS (D) TO PROVIDE A LINK BETWEEN THE HOSPITALS AND THE COMMUNITY WHICH THEY SERVE (E) TO CO-OPERATE WITH ALL OTHER BODIES FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE HOSPITAL SERVICE (F) TO ENCOURAGE INTER-COMMUNICATION AND CO-OPERATION WITH OTHER LEAGUES OF FRIENDS OF HOSPITALS OR WITH OTHER SIMILAR BODIES (G) TO DO ALL SUCH OTHER THINGS AS ARE INCIDENTAL OR CONDUCIVE TO THE ATTAINMENT OF THE ABOVE OBJECTS OR ANY OF THEM
Area of benefit
MATLOCK
Contact information
- Address:
-
AMBERLEY
298 Smedley Street
MATLOCK
DE4 3LH
- Phone:
- 01629584716
- Email:
- info@mhlof.co.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window