THE CAMELOT TRUST
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
This charity is now closed
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2019
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Camden
Governance
- 05 February 1970: Standard registration
- 09 February 2021: Removed (Funds transferred (gi))
- 09 February 2021: Funds transferred to 261261 ST PANCRAS WELFARE TRUST
- ST PANCRAS WELFARE TRUST (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2015 | 31/03/2016 | 31/03/2017 | 31/03/2018 | 31/03/2019 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.41k | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.00k | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2019 | 11 December 2020 | 315 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2019 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2018 | 16 January 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2018 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2017 | 07 December 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2017 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 9TH DECEMBER 1969
Charitable objects
(A) THE RELIEF OF POVERTY WITHIN THE BOUNDARIES OF THE FORMER METROPOLITAN BOROUGH OF ST. PANCRAS AS LAST CONSTITUTED (HEREINAFTER CALLED "THE SAID DISTRICT"); (B) TO PROVIDE HOLIDAYS OR HOLIDAY FACILITIES FOR FAMILIES WITH YOUNG CHILDREN LIVING IN THE SAID DISTRICT WHO BECAUSE OF THEIR NECESSITOUS CIRCUMSTANCES WOULD NOT OTHERWISE IN THE OPINION OF THE TRUSTEES BE ABLE TO AFFORD A HOLIDAY; AND (C) IN SUCH OTHER MANNER BEING CHARITABLE AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION THINK FIT FOR THE BENEFIT OF POOR FAMILIES WITH YOUNG CHILDREN LIVING IN THE SAID DISTRICT.
Area of benefit
AREA COVERED BY THE FORMER METROPOLITAN BOROUGH OF ST. PANCRAS
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window