Trustees FRANK THOMAS MANN ROCKLANDS TRUST
Charity number: 260643

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Amanda-Jayne Buckland | Trustee | 10 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Southgate | Trustee | 16 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Dr PETER RUSHTON | Trustee | 17 August 2016 |
|
|
||||
ELAINE JOHNSON | Trustee | 30 June 2015 |
|
|
||||
Sharon Brown | Trustee | 30 June 2015 |
|
|
||||
KATHRYN THACKER | Trustee | 05 September 2013 |
|
|
||||
DAWN THACKER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
DAVID JONES | Trustee |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.