Accounts and annual returns GREATER MANCHESTER PROBATION AND AFTER-CARE SOCIAL WELFARE FUND

Charity number: 260658
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2017 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2016 09 August 2016 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2015 27 July 2015 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2015 Not Required