Financial history GREATER MANCHESTER PROBATION AND AFTER-CARE SOCIAL WELFARE FUND

Charity number: 260658
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2012 31/03/2013 31/03/2014 31/03/2015 31/03/2016
Total gross income £811 £859 £926 £727 £1.42k
Total expenditure £550 £202 £1.44k £995 £1.09k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A