FRANCISCAN INTERNATIONAL STUDY CENTRE
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Charity is concerned with the provision of courses in Franciscan Studies, Theology and Religious Studies for students of various religious orders, ordinands and laity. Courses are mainly undertaken at the Franciscan International Study Centre in Canterbury, Kent.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2017
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Kent
Governance
- 19 March 1970: Standard registration
- 10 January 2019: Removed (Does not operate)
- FRANCISCAN STUDY CENTRE (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Paying staff
- Risk management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2013 | 30/06/2014 | 30/06/2015 | 30/06/2016 | 30/06/2017 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £355.69k | £320.41k | £348.67k | £376.10k | £290.49k | |
|
Total expenditure | £369.08k | £242.38k | £268.62k | £342.14k | £383.53k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2017 | 10 July 2018 | 71 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2017 | 10 July 2018 | 71 days late | |
Annual return | 30 June 2016 | 23 February 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
30 June 2016
(These accounts |
23 February 2017 | On Time | |
Annual return | 30 June 2015 | 11 February 2016 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2015 | 11 February 2016 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 9TH MARCH 1970 AS AMENDED BY DEED OF VARIATION DATED 1ST JULY 2001 AND DEED OF AMENDMENT DATED 18 OCTOBER 2010
Charitable objects
A CENTRE TO BE CALLED THE FRANCISCAN INTERNATIONAL STUDY CENTRE FOR THE EDUCATION OF FRANCISCANS OR OF THOSE TRAINING TO BE FRANCISCANS AND FOR SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES WHICH ADVANCE THE ROMAN CATHOLIC RELIGION AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window