CHARITY OF LADY REBECCA KINGSMILL

Charity number: 260864
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Grants aid to persons in need who are resident in the Parishes of Kingsclere and Ashford Hill with Headley.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £156
Total expenditure: £0

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
Where the charity operates:
  • Hampshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 17 February 1970: Standard registration
  • 09 June 2018: Removed (Does not operate)
  • 03 July 2018: Re-registered
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • KINGSCLERE CHARITIES (Working name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Conflicting interests
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Peter Eastwick-Field Chair 19 September 2019
None on record
Melanie Johanne Prater Trustee 18 September 2024
REVEREND THOMAS BROWN
Received: On time
THE ROBERT HIGHAM APPRENTICING CHARITY
Received: On time
THE EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION OF ROBERT HIGHAM
Received: On time
KINGSCLERE WELFARE CHARITIES
Received: On time
Andrew Kitch Trustee 24 February 2022
KINGSCLERE WELFARE CHARITIES
Received: On time
THE ROBERT HIGHAM APPRENTICING CHARITY
Received: On time
FRIENDS OF ST MARY'S KINGSCLERE LIMITED
Received: On time
REVEREND THOMAS BROWN
Received: On time
THE EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION OF ROBERT HIGHAM
Received: On time
Susan Adams Trustee 19 November 2019
None on record
Philip Crisford Trustee 22 November 2018
THE EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION OF ROBERT HIGHAM
Received: On time
REVEREND THOMAS BROWN
Received: On time
PENNY STEWART Trustee 01 January 2004
KINGSCLERE WELFARE CHARITIES
Received: On time
REVEREND THOMAS BROWN
Received: On time
THE ROBERT HIGHAM APPRENTICING CHARITY
Received: On time
THE EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION OF ROBERT HIGHAM
Received: On time
PATRICK DRING Trustee
KINGSCLERE WELFARE CHARITIES
Received: On time
THE EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION OF ROBERT HIGHAM
Received: On time
REVEREND THOMAS BROWN
Received: On time
THE ROBERT HIGHAM APPRENTICING CHARITY
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £26 £17 £0 £41 £156
Total expenditure £37 £35 £34 £63 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 10 September 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 09 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 18 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 13 July 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 09 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
6 Cedar Drive
Kingsclere
NEWBURY
Berkshire
RG20 5TB
Phone:
07884182696
Website:

No information available