Accounts and annual returns WEYMOUTH AND PORTLAND CITIZENS ADVICE BUREAU

Charity number: 260883
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2007 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2007 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2006 15 February 2007 15 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2006 15 February 2007 15 days late
Annual return 31 March 2005 31 January 2006 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2005 31 January 2006 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2004 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2004 Not submitted