THE SEABIRD GROUP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The principal aim of the Charity is to promote the study and conservation of seabirds. The Group aims to increase the amount and quality of research on seabirds and to educate Group members and others of the importance of seabirds and their environment.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £2,000 from 1 government grant(s)
People

9 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Animals
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 28 April 1970: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Alex Bond | Chair | 25 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Debs Allbrook | Trustee | 24 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Alice Edney | Trustee | 24 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Eryn Shinnie | Trustee | 24 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Ingrid Pollet | Trustee | 24 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Antoine Grissot | Trustee | 25 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jacqui Glencross | Trustee | 12 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Katherine Booth-Jones | Trustee | 01 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
Jeff Stratford | Trustee | 01 November 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £7.43k | £5.53k | £12.66k | £16.53k | £14.60k | |
|
Total expenditure | £6.36k | £9.52k | £11.02k | £15.85k | £9.73k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £1.90k | £2.00k | £2.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 21 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 23 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 30 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 19 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 13 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 8TH JANUARY 1966
Charitable objects
PROMOTION AND BETTER CO-ORDINATION OF THE STUDY OF SEABIRDS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
58 Tramway Road
LIVERPOOL
L17 7AZ
- Phone:
- 07480656356
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window