THE ANTIQUARIAN HOROLOGICAL SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To encourage the study of all matters relating to the art and history of time measurement. To foster and disseminate original research, and to encourage the preservation of examples of the horological and allied arts.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023
People

12 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England
Governance
- 08 April 1970: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr JAMES NYE | Chair |
|
||||||
Tabea Rude | Trustee | 16 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Susan Victoria Hines | Trustee | 07 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Mann | Trustee | 07 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
JANE DESBOROUGH | Trustee | 18 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Anna Hermione Holmes | Trustee | 18 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Robert Woolgar Wren FBHI | Trustee | 18 May 2019 |
|
|||||
KEITH ANDREW SCOBIE-YOUNGS | Trustee | 12 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
FRANCOISE ISABELLE COLLANGES | Trustee | 12 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
JAMES STRATTON | Trustee | 16 May 2015 |
|
|
||||
RICHARD STENNING | Trustee | 16 May 2015 |
|
|
||||
DAVID ROONEY | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £594.75k | £1.03m | £181.49k | £150.33k | £184.02k | |
|
Total expenditure | £218.72k | £223.90k | £164.06k | £172.26k | £204.01k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £344.12k | £717.94k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £14.01k | £13.23k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £282 | £209 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | £848 | £498 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | £235.49k | £298.31k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £218.72k | £223.64k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £215.65k | £220.75k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £256 | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 08 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | 08 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 19 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | 19 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 24 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | 24 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 24 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | 24 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 30 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | 30 July 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 04/12/1954 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 20/11/1959 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 18/05/1961 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 12/10/1961 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 08/05/1987 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 06/05/1988 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 19/05/1990 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 15/05/1993 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 13/05/1995 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 14/05/2011
Charitable objects
TO PRACTICE AND FOSTER THE STUDY OF ANTIQUARIAN HOROLOGY AND ALLIED SCIENCES AND OF ARTICLES USED OR DEALT IN BY PERSONS INTERESTED THEREIN, AND IN CONNECTION THEREWITH TO HOLD EXAMINATIONS AND TESTS, TO AWARD PRIZES, DIPLOMAS, MEDALS, CERTIFICATES AND SCHOLARSHIPS, TO FOUND AND MAINTAIN LIBRARIES AND COLLECTIONS OF ANTIQUE WATCHES, CLOCKS AND OTHER ALLIED OBJECTS AND TO DO ANYTHING WHICH WILL FURTHER RESEARCH AND STUDY OF THE SUBJECT AND OF THE MATERIALS AND ARTICLES OR ANY OF THEM.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Antiquarian Horological Society
4 Lovat Lane
LONDON
EC3R 8DT
- Phone:
- 07733 481595
- Email:
- secretary@ahsoc.org
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window