Financial history BRITISH POULTRY SCIENCE LTD

Charity number: 260942
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £84.48k £82.26k £87.00k £90.54k £88.88k
Total expenditure £58.85k £68.11k £64.96k £64.83k £75.77k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A