Trustees BRITISH POULTRY SCIENCE LTD
Charity number: 260942

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
19 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DR JULIE TAYLOR-PICKARD | Chair | 23 May 2011 |
|
|
||||
Dr Birger Svihus | Trustee | 10 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Raqian Zhao | Trustee | 10 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Natalie Karron Morgan | Trustee | 10 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Pawel Konieczka | Trustee | 10 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Professor Emily Jane Burton PhD | Trustee | 10 July 2018 |
|
|||||
Dr Vasil Pirgozliev | Trustee | 07 August 2017 |
|
|
||||
Dr Bas Rodenburg | Trustee | 07 August 2017 |
|
|
||||
Dr Andrew Butterworth | Trustee | 07 August 2017 |
|
|
||||
Dr Juliet Roberts | Trustee | 27 July 2015 |
|
|
||||
DR Michael Bedford | Trustee | 21 July 2015 |
|
|
||||
Dr Mohan Raj | Trustee | 03 July 2014 |
|
|
||||
Dr Ian Dunn | Trustee | 03 July 2014 |
|
|
||||
Dr Nicholas Sparks | Trustee | 03 July 2014 |
|
|
||||
Dr GENE PESTI | Trustee | 14 May 2013 |
|
|
||||
Dr JAMES SAMUEL BENTLEY | Trustee | 23 May 2011 |
|
|
||||
Dr VICTORIA SANDILANDS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Dr MAUREEN BAIN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Dr DANIEL GUEMENE | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.