THE OXTED AND DISTRICT CITIZENS' ADVICE BUREAU
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Independent and free,confidential and impartial advice to everybody regardless of race,gender,sexuality or disability. The CAB is based in Oxted and covers the surrounding areas of Surrey.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2009
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Kent
- Surrey
Governance
- 09 April 1970: Standard registration
- 10 May 2010: Removed (Funds transferred (incor))
- 10 May 2010: Funds transferred to 1135256 THE OXTED AND DISTRICT CITIZENS' ADVICE BUREAU
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2005 | 31/03/2006 | 31/03/2007 | 31/03/2008 | 31/03/2009 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £47.66k | £50.01k | £51.71k | £48.13k | £48.86k | |
|
Total expenditure | £44.75k | £47.91k | £51.41k | £48.24k | £49.09k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2009 | 08 September 2009 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2009 | 08 September 2009 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2008 | 12 July 2008 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2008 | 22 July 2008 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2007 | 17 December 2007 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2007 | 17 December 2007 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2006 | 06 November 2006 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2006 | 06 November 2006 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2005 | 02 December 2005 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2005 | 02 December 2005 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 18 MARCH 1970
Charitable objects
A. THE BUREAU IS ESTABLISHED FOR CHARITABLE PURPOSES ONLY B. IN PARTICULAR THE BUREAU IS ESTABLISHED TO PROMOTE ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE COMMUNITY IN OXTED AND DISTRICT (HEREINAFTER CALLED THE "AREA OF BENEFIT") BY THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION, THE FURTHERANCE OF HEALTH AND THE RELIEF OF POVERTY, DISTRESS AND SICKNESS.
Area of benefit
OXTED AND DISTRICT
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window