THE SLATER FOUNDATION LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Support of a wide range of organisations including the relief of suffering amoungst the aged and the poor, the advancement of education and to further such other charitable objects as the company may think fit.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
2 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Amateur Sport
- Animals
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
- Scotland
Governance
- 09 April 1970: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Mark Kingsley Collingbourne | Trustee | 20 February 2011 |
|
|
||||
HELEN SLATER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
CHRIS SLATER | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £13.42k | £4.85k | £14.39k | £11.99k | £14.93k | |
|
Total expenditure | £28.17k | £31.77k | £29.56k | £32.41k | £34.01k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 23 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 22 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 25 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 24 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 22 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 6TH FEBRUARY 1970 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION INCORPORATED 17TH JULY 1970 AND SPECIAL RESOLUTION OF 10 JANUARY 2008
Charitable objects
1. TO RELIEVE SUFFERING AMONGST THE AGED, IMPOTENT OR POOR. 2. TO ADVANCE EDUCATION. 3. TO FURTHER SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE OBJECTS AS THE COMPANY MAY THINK FIT.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
INGLISFIELD
HADDINGTON
EH41 4JH
- Phone:
- 01620810183
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window