VERNON CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Donations to charitable activities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Animals
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 13 April 1970: Standard registration
- THE VERNON CHARITABLE TRUST (Previous name)
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MRS J E FITZALAN HOWARD | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ALEXANDER RUPERT FITZALAN HOWARD | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £10.28k | £7.94k | £9.23k | £10.32k | £10.68k | |
|
Total expenditure | £9.69k | £8.98k | £8.36k | £11.96k | £10.16k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 10 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 30 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 20 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 30 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 05 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DEED OF SETTLEMENT DATED 6 MARCH 1970
Charitable objects
FOR EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE PURPOSES AND IN PARTICULAR FOR: 1. CHARITIES FOR THE CONTROL OF WORLD POPULATION. 2. CHARITIES FOR THE PROMOTION OF RACIAL HARONY. 3. CHARITIES FOR THE ALLEVIATION OF MENTAL AND PHYSICAL SUFFERIN. 4. CHARITIES FOR THE MAINTENANCE AND RESTORATION OF HISTORIC BUILDINGS AND OTHER WORKS OF ART. 5. CHARITIES CONNECTED WITH SUDBURY POYNTON OR OTHER PROPERTIES WHICH EITHER BELONG TO OR HAVE BELONGED TO THE VERNON FAMILY.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Estate Office
Sudbury
Ashbourne
Derbyshire
DE6 5HT
- Phone:
- 01283585204
- Email:
- arfitzalanhoward@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window