LANGTON MATRAVERS VILLAGE HALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We provide a service, including various activities and use of Village Hall for the residents of Langton Matravers. We have also built up a small library where refreshments are served, it is open twice a month for two hours.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

9 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Dorset
Governance
- 19 June 1970: Standard registration
No other names
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Lindy jane Cameron | Trustee | 25 March 2025 |
|
|||||
Louise Elizabeth Counsell | Trustee | 25 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Nicola Julie Glassock | Trustee | 21 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Patricia Ann Wright | Trustee | 21 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
David Hitchcock | Trustee | 17 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Margaret Mary Sutton | Trustee | 16 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Daryle Pearson | Trustee | 16 February 2022 |
|
|||||
Steven James Hutchings | Trustee | 11 March 2020 |
|
|||||
KEITH COOMBS | Trustee | 18 July 2013 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £14.63k | £22.26k | £10.12k | £9.05k | £11.44k | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.96k | £30.95k | £10.11k | £9.45k | £10.49k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | £3.67k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £10.00k | £17.93k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 16 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 14 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 18 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 25 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 09 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONVEYANCE AND TRUST DEED DATED 1ST JANUARY 1970 AND SCHEMES OF THE COMMISSIONERS DATED 25TH JUNE 1971 AND 31 JULY 2000.
Charitable objects
FOR THE PURPOSES OF A VILLAGE HALL FOR THE USE OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE PARISH OF LANGTON MATRAVERS IN THE COUNTY OF DORSET (HEREINAFTER CALLED THE AREA OF BENEFIT) WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF POLICITAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS INCLUDING USE FOR MEETINGS, LECTURES AND CLASSES AND FOR OTHER FORMS OF RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS.
Area of benefit
LANGTON MATRAVERS
Contact information
- Address:
-
Peveril
East Drove
Langton Matravers
Swanage
BH19 3HF
- Phone:
- 07973437191
- Website:
-
Info@langtonvillagehall.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window