CHARITY OF SIR JOHN PETTUS AND OTHERS

Charity number: 261006
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

A Charity which receives income from historic investments for use within the Parish of St George Tombland, Norwich

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024

Total income: £543
Total expenditure: £500

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Norfolk

Governance

Registration history:
  • 11 August 1970: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

3 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Father Alaric Lewis Chair 05 June 2018
None on record
John Michael Brydon Trustee 23 April 2017
FLORENCE CLARKE CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
THE MRS R J COLMAN TRUST
Received: On time
THE QUEEN VICTORIA CLERGY FUND
Received: On time
Richard Charles Norton Trustee 17 April 2016
MATTISHALL AND BURGH CHARITY
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £556 £509 £521 £630 £543
Total expenditure £2.50k £550 £735 £500 £500
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2024 05 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2023 04 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 19 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 06 February 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 04 February 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
53 Norwich Common
Wymondham
NR18 0SW
Phone:
01953601053