WELL CREEK TRUST LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To sponsor the preservation,beautification and public use of the Well Creek in all its aspects, including boating and navigation,fishing,skating,nature conservation and village landscaping and amenities
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
People

9 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableOne or more of the employees were formerly trustees
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Cambridgeshire
- Norfolk
Governance
- 28 May 1970: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
GRAHAME ALFRED SEATON | Chair |
|
|
|||||
MARTIN RAWLINGS | Trustee | 20 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Paul Mather | Trustee | 25 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
PAUL JETSON | Trustee | 06 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
MARTIN HUGH SCOTT | Trustee | 06 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Michael James Kelly | Trustee | 04 February 2016 |
|
|
||||
JOHN LEO DELANEY | Trustee | 04 June 2013 |
|
|
||||
ALLAN GULLON | Trustee | 23 February 2012 |
|
|
||||
MR DICK GODFREY | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.50k | £2.34k | £5.92k | £31.18k | £10.93k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.29k | £4.24k | £3.39k | £33.48k | £5.92k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £15.00k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 02 May 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 17 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 17 February 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 21 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 05 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 12 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 23RD MARCH 1970 AS AMENDED ON THE 26TH JANUARY 1971
Charitable objects
FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC TO: A1. PROTECT, PRESERVE, DEVELOP AND MAINTAIN AS PLACES OF GENERAL PUBLIC AMENITY, FEATURES OF NATURAL BEAUTY OR OF BOTANICAL, ORNITHOLOGICAL, GEOLOGICAL. ZOOLOGICAL AND SCIENTIFIC INTEREST. A2. TO ESTABLISH, FORM, OWN AND MAINTAIN SANCTUARIES OR RESERVES FOR THE PRESERVATION O BIRDS OR OTHER ANIMALS AND TO ESTABLISH, FORM AND MAINTAIN RESERVES FOR WILD PLANTS. A3. TO ENCOURAGE THE BREEDING OF WILD BIRDS WHICH ARE HARMLESS, BEAUTIFUL OR RARE. A4. TO PREVENT THE KILLING OF BIRDS OR ANIMALS WHICH ARE IN DANGER OF EXTINCTION OR SERIOUS DIMINUTION. A5. TO SPONSOR THE PRESERVATION, BEAUTIFICATION AND PUBLIC USE OF WELL CREEK IN ALL ITS ASPECTS INCLUDING BOATING AND NAVIGATION, FISHING, SKATING, NATURE CONSERVATION AND VILLAGE LANDSCAPING AND AMENITIES (FOR FURTHER DETAILS SEE MEMORANDUM).
Area of benefit
UPWELL, OUTWELL, NORDELPH DOWNHAM WEST
Contact information
- Address:
-
Sylvia House
Thurlands Drove
Upwell
WISBECH
PE14 9AP
- Phone:
- 01945772354
- Email:
- info@wellcreektrust.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window