Financial history THE PORTHLEVEN PUBLIC HALL AND WOMEN'S INSTITUTE

Charity Number: 261124
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £13.68k £38.50k £9.12k £6.30k £22.36k
Total expenditure £4.81k £8.00k £32.44k £6.47k £19.99k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £11.33k £18.60k N/A N/A N/A