Financial history THE DIECASTING SOCIETY LIMITED

Charity number: 261128
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £18.56k £6.15k £14.19k £13.94k £12.34k
Total expenditure £16.11k £11.72k £14.02k £20.76k £14.99k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A