ROTARY CLUB OF WESTCLIFF-ON-SEA BENEVOLENT FUND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Raising money and providing support to local, national and international causes. The development of acquaintance as an opportunity for service. The advancement of international understanding, goodwill and peace through a world of fellowship.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Southend-on-sea
Governance
- 06 July 1970: Standard registration
- ROTARY CLUB OF WESTCLIFF-ON-SEA (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
GRAHAM REEDER | Trustee | 16 March 2012 |
|
|||||||
GEOFF BRENNAN | Trustee | 16 March 2012 |
|
|
||||||
MIKE HAYWARD | Trustee | 16 March 2012 |
|
|
||||||
ALAN SAMUELS | Trustee | 16 March 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £5.93k | £4.50k | £7.09k | £6.31k | £6.22k | |
|
Total expenditure | £6.02k | £5.92k | £3.49k | £8.26k | £6.81k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 26 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 10 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 26 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 25 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 05 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 31ST DECEMBER 1969
Charitable objects
TO OR FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE POOR AND NEEDY OR TO OR FOR THE BENEFIT OF SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE INSTITUTIONS, SOCIETIES AND OBJECTS AS THE CLUB SHALL IN DULY CONSTITUTED MEETINGS FROM TIME TO TIME DIRECT.
Area of benefit
WESTCLIFF-ON-SEA
Contact information
- Address:
-
36 KENILWORTH GARDENS
WESTCLIFF-ON-SEA
SS0 0BH
- Phone:
- 07811702229
- Email:
- SouthendFrog@aol.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window