CHURCH OF GOD IN CHRIST UNITED U K

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Marriage. Babies and children dedication. Baptism. Funeral Ceremonies. Evangelize and preach the gospel. Children and young people day out and fun day, Christian counselling and bereavement visits and Home, Hospital, Prison and School visits
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 27 January 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout London
Governance
- 09 June 1972: Standard registration
- CHURCH OF GOD IN CHRIST UNITED UK (Previous name)
- CONGREGATIONAL CHURCH OF GOD IN CHRIST UNITED (Previous name)
- CONGREGATIONAL CHURCH OF GOD IN CHRIST UNITED UK (Previous name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
James Williams | Trustee | 24 October 2019 |
|
|||||
Lascelles Lakelet Morgan | Trustee | 24 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Zacchaeus Henry Berwise | Trustee | 24 October 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 27/01/2020 | 27/01/2021 | 27/01/2022 | 27/01/2023 | 27/01/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.58k | £340 | £955 | £1.77k | £2.28k | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £117 | £236 | £234 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 27 January 2024 | 23 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 27 January 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 27 January 2023 | 11 April 2024 | 136 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 27 January 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 27 January 2022 | 17 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 27 January 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 27 January 2021 | 20 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 27 January 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 27 January 2020 | 16 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 27 January 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
RESOLUTIONS PASSED 24 OCTOBER 1969, 20 JULY 1974, 19 MAY 1975, 6 APRIL 1985, 8 NOVEMBER 1985 AND 6 JANUARY 1990
Charitable objects
FOR THE PROVISION OF A NATIONAL HEADQUARTERS BUILDING, PROMOTING, PROCLAIMING AND UPHOLDING THE GOSPEL OF JESUS CHRIST AND MISSIONARY WORK INCLUDING MUSICAL INSTRUMENTS AND TRANSPORTATIONS
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Flat 2
Milton House Mansions
Shacklewell Lane
LONDON
E8 2EH
- Phone:
- 02072540129
- Email:
- cogicuukis@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window