ST PANCRAS WELFARE TRUST

Charity Number: 261261
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

During the year the Trust received over 400 applications from referral agencies on behalf of clients in need; most of these were supported. Project grants to Community Associations and Schools were also supported. Beneficiaries must live within the boundary of the former Metropolitan Borough of St Pancras.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £116,555
Total expenditure: £151,893

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

One or more trustees receive payments or benefits from the charity for providing services to the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
Where the charity operates:
  • Camden

Governance

Registration history:
  • 15 June 1971: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Risk management
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

11 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Charlotte Maizels Chair 03 December 2015
None on record
CLARE HOUSE Trustee 01 August 2022
HOME-START CAMDEN AND ISLINGTON
Received: On time
David Goldesgeyme Trustee 05 February 2021
None on record
Daniel Carrier Trustee 04 November 2020
None on record
COUNCILLOR JENNY HEADLAM-WELLS Trustee 05 November 2014
None on record
Richard Cotton Trustee 03 June 2014
None on record
Cllr Nasim ALi Trustee 14 October 2013
None on record
JILL FRASER Trustee 08 November 2011
None on record
Eleanor Sturdy Trustee
None on record
CLIVE LEVERTON Trustee
None on record
THE MAYOR OF CAMDEN Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £123.58k £95.78k £2.72m £127.09k £116.56k
Total expenditure £130.16k £112.46k £104.98k £113.13k £151.89k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A £2.67m N/A N/A
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A £0 N/A N/A
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A £0 N/A N/A
Income - Endowments N/A N/A £2.67m N/A N/A
Income - Investment N/A N/A £45.79k N/A N/A
Income - Other N/A N/A £327 N/A N/A
Income - Legacies N/A N/A £0 N/A N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A £80.36k N/A N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A £24.63k N/A N/A
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A £5.35k N/A N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A £0 N/A N/A
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A £0 N/A N/A
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A £0 N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 14 November 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 14 November 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 13 May 2024 103 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 13 May 2024 103 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 28 November 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 28 November 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 20 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 20 January 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 03 December 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 03 December 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Linked charities

Linked charities
Governing document
SCHEME DATED 15/06/1971 AS AMENDED ON 18/10/2011
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE EITHER GENERALLY OR INDIVIDUALLY PERSONS RESIDENT IN THE METROPOLITAN BOROUGH OF ST PANCRAS AS CONSTITUTED ON THE 31 MARCH 1965 WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED, HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS - BY MAKING GRANTS OF MONEY OR PROVIDING OR PAYING FOR ITEMS, SERVICES OR FACILITIES.
Area of benefit
SEE OBJECTS
Registration history
  • 15 June 1971 : Standard registration

Contact information

Address:
C/O Leverton & Sons Ltd
210-214 Eversholt Street
LONDON
NW1 1BD
Phone:
07973830060