Financial history FMP INTERNATIONAL

Charity number: 261347
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2010 31/12/2011 31/12/2012 31/12/2013 31/12/2014
Total gross income £1.56m £1.93m £1.44m £1.47m £726.28k
Total expenditure £1.68m £2.27m £1.48m £1.50m £893.42k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £1.56m £1.93m £1.44m £1.47m £726.28k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £11 £0 £0 £176 £0
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £2.00k £34.80k £1.59k £11.55k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.38m £1.87m £1.14m £1.14m £610.58k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Governance £20.32k £20.05k £16.72k £16.61k £15.73k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £401.10k £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0