LAWSON BECKMAN CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 261378
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Grant making.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £242,047
Total expenditure: £124,442

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Education/training
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
  • Disability
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
  • Overseas Aid/famine Relief
  • Accommodation/housing
  • Religious Activities
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales

Governance

Registration history:
  • 31 July 1970: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Trust
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Risk management
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

3 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
LYNTON ROBERT STOCK Trustee 11 January 2006
None on record
FRANCIS COLIN KATZ Trustee 11 January 2006
None on record
MELVIN ANTHONY LAWSON Trustee 15 February 1993
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £115.64k £691.58k £137.06k £125.67k £242.05k
Total expenditure £108.20k £130.13k £101.42k £125.97k £124.44k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A £582.35k N/A N/A N/A
Income - Other trading activities N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Charitable activities N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Endowments N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Investment N/A £109.23k N/A N/A N/A
Income - Other N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Legacies N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A £125.84k N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A £4.29k N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Governance N/A £3.89k N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A £121.95k N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Investment management N/A £4.29k N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Other N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 30 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 30 January 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 31 May 2024 121 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 31 May 2024 121 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 27 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 27 January 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 28 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 28 January 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 29 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 29 January 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
A.B GROUP LTD
2ND FLOOR
25 OLD BURLINGTON STREET
LONDON
W1S 3AN
Phone:
02077348111
Website:

No information available