THE BALINT SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Society promotes and advances research and study on the psychological aspects of general practice with special reference to the doctor patient relationship and disseminates the knowledge beyond the Society for the improvement of the medical care of the public at large. The society does this through conferences,workshops,a lecture series,publications and advice to other organisations.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
- Northern Ireland
Governance
- 31 July 1970: Standard registration
- THE MEDICAL SOCIETY OF BALINT GROUPS (Previous name)
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Amelia Gledhill | Trustee | 01 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Christopher Brown | Trustee | 01 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
DR ANDREAS KYRRIS | Trustee | 01 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Marie King | Trustee | 02 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Vikram Luthra | Trustee | 27 September 2020 |
|
|||||
Dr Raluca Soreanu | Trustee | 27 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dr Anne Patterson | Trustee | 16 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Dr Ann Dilys Evans | Trustee | 01 April 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £71.10k | £43.26k | £83.47k | £80.80k | £80.70k | |
|
Total expenditure | £79.11k | £32.66k | £48.34k | £84.32k | £79.75k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 30 April 2025 | 89 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 30 April 2025 | 89 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 25 April 2023 | 84 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 25 April 2023 | 84 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 19 March 2022 | 47 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 19 March 2022 | 47 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 05 December 2021 | 308 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 05 December 2021 | 308 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 28/04/1970 AS AMENDED ON 28/04/1971 AS AMENDED ON 02/05/1972 AS AMENDED ON 30/06/2011 AS AMENDED ON 09 APR 2016
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE AND ADVANCE DISCUSSION GROUPS USING THE BALINT METHOD, AND RESEARCH AND STUDIES ON THE PSYCHOLOGICAL ASPECTS OF HEALTH AND SOCIAL CARE, WITH SPECIAL REFERENCE TO THE PROFESSIONAL–PATIENT / CLIENT RELATIONSHIP AND TO DISSEMINATE THIS KNOWLEDGE BEYOND THE SOCIETY FOR THE IMPROVEMENT OF THE CARE OF THE PUBLIC AT LARGE
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
10 Park Avenue
Princes Avenue
HULL
HU5 3ER
- Phone:
- 07973105475
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window