Governing document THE HEATHER SOCIETY
Charity Number: 261407
Removed charity
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
RULES ADOPTED 29TH APRIL 1970 AS REVISED 2ND SEPTEMBER 1979 RULES AS AMENDED ON 12/09/2010 AS AMENDED ON 13/09/2015 AS AMENDED ON 11 SEP 2016 AS AMENDED ON 10 SEP 2017 as amended on 14 Sep 2019
Charitable objects
TO ASSIST THE ADVANCEMENT OF HORTICULTURE AND IN PARTICULAR THE IMPROVEMENT OF AND RESEARCH INTO THE GROWING OF HEATHS AND HEATHERS AND ALLIED PLANTS
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
NOT DEFINED
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.