WYCOMBE ARTS FESTIVAL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We organise and fund an Arts Festival held every May in and around High Wycombe. We include drama, music and exhibitions of art and photography.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2021
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Buckinghamshire
Governance
- 24 August 1970: Standard registration
No other names
- Care Quality Commission
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JOHN WILLIAM BEAUMONT | Chair |
|
|
|||||
GAIL MYRLA SALTER | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2017 | 30/06/2018 | 30/06/2019 | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.64k | £2.48k | £3.12k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.92k | £4.01k | £4.08k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 20 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 20 days | |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 385 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 385 days | |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 751 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 751 days | |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 29 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 05 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTIONION ADOPTED 16TH JUNE 1970, AMENDED 4TH JULY 1978, JULY 1981 AND 2ND JULY 1985
Charitable objects
FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC TO PROMOTE THE ADVANCEMENT OF LEARNING AND IN PRTICULAR THE ART AND SCIENCE OF MUSIC, DRAMA, THE FINE ARTS, THE CREATIVE ARTS, BOTH AMATEUR AND PROFESSIONAL BY THE PRESENTATION OF CONCERTS PERFORMANCES AND EXHIBITIONS DURING THE WYCOMBE ARTS FESTIVAL TO BE HELD ANNUALLY OR AS THE OCCASION MAY RISE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
EDGEHILL
STANLEY ROAD
HIGH WYCOMBE
HP12 4DB
- Phone:
- 01494814039
- Email:
- johnw.beau@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window