THE BARTONS VICTORY MEMORIAL HALL FUND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provision of Playing Fields and associated facilities including football pitches, a multi use games area, childrens play area, bowling green, social club and community hall with ancillary facilities, for the benefit of the inhabitants of the Parishes of Steeple Barton and Westcote Barton. This is partially achieved by leasing the social facilities to a separate non-profit making organisation.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 November 2024
Total income includes £2,000 from 1 government grant(s)
People

3 Trustee(s)
19 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Oxfordshire
Governance
- 25 August 1970: Standard registration
- PLAYING FIELDS (Working name)
- CHARITY FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE PARISHES OF STEEPLE BARTON AND WESTCOTT BARTON (Previous name)
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Jane Wright | Trustee | 01 January 2021 |
|
|||||||
ELAINE MURIEL STEVENS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
ALLAN MARK STEWART | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/11/2020 | 30/11/2021 | 30/11/2022 | 30/11/2023 | 30/11/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £14.71k | £26.59k | £30.68k | £26.54k | £52.68k | |
|
Total expenditure | £22.68k | £19.34k | £23.49k | £36.50k | £31.68k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £4.10k | £2.72k | £2.34k | £3.75k | £2.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 November 2024 | 01 May 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2024 | 01 May 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 November 2023 | 24 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2023 | 24 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 November 2022 | 07 August 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2022 | 07 August 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 November 2021 | 05 October 2022 | 5 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2021 | 05 October 2022 | 5 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 November 2020 | 01 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONVEYANCE DATED 28TH JUNE 1948 AND TRUST DEED DATED 3RD AUGUST 1976
Charitable objects
FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE SAID PARISHES OF STEEPLE BARTON AND WESTCOTT BARTON.
Area of benefit
STEEPLE BARTON AND WESTCOTT BARTON
Contact information
- Address:
-
17 Marshall Crescent
Middle Barton
CHIPPING NORTON
OX7 7HA
- Phone:
- 07970 144980
- Email:
- BVMHFSEC@GMAIL.COM
- Website:
-
bvmhf.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window