WORTON UNITED CHARITIES

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Assistance for the poor and needy in the village
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Wiltshire
Governance
- 12 December 1970: Standard registration
- 28 March 2000: Removed (Does not operate)
No other names
- Investment
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
WILLIAM MARK FRANCIS | Chair | 10 May 2011 |
|
|||||
Rev Gerard James Lynch | Trustee | 01 February 2024 |
|
|||||
Christopher Kinnersley Nixon | Trustee | 01 February 2022 |
|
|||||
Alison Cross | Trustee | 01 January 1995 |
|
|||||
JUNE MASON | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £270 | £669 | £668 | £940 | £150 | |
|
Total expenditure | £203 | £228 | £478 | £240 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 01 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 30 April 2024 | 182 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 16 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 16 February 2022 | 108 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 18 March 2021 | 138 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SEE INDIVIDUAL CONSTITUENTS.
Charitable objects
SEE INDIVIDUAL CONSTITUENTS.
Area of benefit
PARISH OF WORTON
Linked charities
- 12 December 1970 : Standard registration
- 28 March 2000 : Removed
Contact information
- Address:
-
9 MILL ROAD
WORTON
DEVIZES
SN10 5SF
- Phone:
- 01380721883
- Email:
- alisoncross60@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window