MARSTON AND WORTON UNITED CHARITIES

Charity Number: 261481
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Providing financial assistance to the poor and needy in the villages

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £150
Total expenditure: £0

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
Where the charity operates:
  • Wiltshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 12 December 1970: Standard registration
  • 25 February 2000: Removed (Does not operate)
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Conflicting interests
  • Investment
  • Risk management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
WILLIAM MARK FRANCIS Chair 10 May 2011
WORTON UNITED CHARITIES
Received: On time
Rev Gerard James Lynch Trustee 01 February 2024
WORTON UNITED CHARITIES
Received: On time
POTTERNE UNITED CHARITIES
Received: On time
Christopher Kinnersley Nixon Trustee 01 February 2022
WORTON UNITED CHARITIES
Received: On time
Alison Cross Trustee 01 January 1995
WORTON UNITED CHARITIES
Received: On time
JUNE MASON Trustee
WORTON UNITED CHARITIES
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £0 £141 £145 £147 £150
Total expenditure £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 01 July 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 30 April 2024 182 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 16 February 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 16 February 2022 108 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 18 March 2021 138 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Linked charities

Linked charities
Governing document
A.C. REPORT WILTSHIRE VOL. 1 PAGES 811-835 AND SCHEME OF 28 NOVEMBER 1916.
Charitable objects
PROVISION OF OUTER GARMENTS FOR FIVE OF THE OLDEST AND POOREST MEN AND FIVE OF THE OLDEST AND POOREST WOMEN OF THE PARISHES AT THE BEGINNING OF EVERY WINTER.
Area of benefit
PARISHES OF WORTON AND MARSTON.
Registration history
  • 12 December 1970 : Standard registration
  • 25 February 2000 : Removed

Contact information

Address:
9 MILL ROAD
WORTON
DEVIZES
SN10 5SF
Phone:
01380721883
Website:

No information available