THE LANCASTRIAN THEATRE ORGAN TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
1. To advance the appreciation and knowledge to the public in the art of theatre organ music. 2. To acquire, preserve and operate those theatre organs which are of historic and educational value for the benefit of the public.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
- Canada
- France
- Germany
- Scotland
- United States
Governance
- 21 August 1970: Standard registration
- 05 April 2024: Funds received from 1151467 BOLLINGTON COMMUNITY HERITAGE TRUST
- THE LTOT (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
GEORGE WALTER BAKER | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Ian Gander | Trustee | 02 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
John Frederick Loud | Trustee | 03 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Charles Brown | Trustee | 05 December 2016 |
|
|
||||
Ronald Humphrey Whalley | Trustee | 09 September 1986 |
|
|
||||
VICTOR BARRY MATTHEWS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | 31/07/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £20.94k | £43.85k | £33.64k | £35.42k | £32.85k | |
|
Total expenditure | £20.38k | £25.05k | £27.04k | £35.54k | £28.29k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | £550 | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £10.00k | £19.92k | £2.67k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2024 | 08 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2024 | 08 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 14 June 2024 | 14 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | 16 July 2024 | 46 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 31 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | 31 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 05 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | 05 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 18 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION AND RULES ADOPTED 9 JULY 1970 AS AMENDED 21 SEPTEMBER 1978 AND 23 NOVEMBER 2008.
Charitable objects
(1) TO ADVANCE THE APPRECIATION AND KNOWLEDGE TO THE PUBLIC IN THE ART OF THEATRE ORGAN MUSIC. (2) TO ACQUIRE AND PRESERVE THOSE THEATRE ORGANS WHICH ARE OF HISTORIC AND EDUCATIONAL VALUE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
The LTOT Heritage Centre
2A Alexander Road
Peel Green
Salford
Lancashire
M30 7HJ
- Phone:
- 01619899415
- Email:
- secretary@ltot.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window