Trustees KINGSTON CHORAL SOCIETY

Charity number: 261522
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
PETER WICKENDEN Trustee 05 December 2024
MALDEN AND CUDDINGTON JUBILEE CLUB AND INSTITUTE
Received: On time
Sarah Moreton Trustee 24 October 2024
None on record
Jeanette Hull Trustee 12 October 2023
None on record
Jane Harnden Trustee 14 October 2021
None on record
Kate Cockle Trustee 14 October 2021
None on record
Debbie Lye Trustee 24 September 2020
None on record